TN SB2590 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the board of osteopathic examination to issue advisory private letter rulings upon request to affected licensees regarding matters within the board's primary jurisdiction; provides that such rulings only affect the licensee making the inquiry and have no precedential value for another inquiry or future contested case that might come before the board. - Amends TCA Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, relative to osteopathic physicians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-08 Effective date(s) 04/04/2024
2024-04-08 Pub. Ch. 651
2024-04-04SenateSigned by Governor.
2024-03-26SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2024-03-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2024-03-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2024-03-20SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2024-03-18HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2024-03-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2024-03-18SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2024-03-18SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2024-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2024
2024-03-13SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2024-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024
2024-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2024
2024-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2024
2024-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2522 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 651

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback