TN SB2588 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1006
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1006
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, by January 1, 2017, the district attorney general of each judicial district to establish, or cause to be established, a vulnerable adult protective investigative team (VAPIT). - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, requires, by January 1, 2017, the district attorney general of each judicial district to establish, or cause to be established, a vulnerable adult protective investigative team (VAPIT). - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 1006 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1000) |
2016-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0800) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1936 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1006