TN SB2587 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the dyslexia advisory council to submit its annual report to the education committee of the senate, the education administration and planning committee of the house of representatives, and the education instruction and programs committee of the house of representatives no later than December 31 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the dyslexia advisory council to submit its annual report to the education committee of the senate, the education administration and planning committee of the house of representatives, and the education instruction and programs committee of the house of representatives no later than December 31 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2003 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Def. to Summer Study in Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback