TN SB2585 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits amount candidate may personally loan campaign to $100,000 per election but does not limit amount candidate may contribute to campaign; creates voluntary spending limits for statewide candidates. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
As introduced, limits amount candidate may personally loan campaign to $100,000 per election but does not limit amount candidate may contribute to campaign; creates voluntary spending limits for statewide candidates. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2941 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-31 - Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2585&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2585.pdf |