TN SB2584 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that each year of progressive practical experience required of an applicant to qualify as a registered land surveyor be spent under the direct supervision of a practicing professional land surveyor rather than just part of the time an applicant receives such experience; adds requirement that certain applicants be certified as a professional land surveyor in training (PLSIT) as part of the application to qualify as a registered land surveyor. - Amends TCA Section 62-18-109.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 62-18-109, relative to land surveyors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-08 Effective date(s) 04/04/2024
2024-04-08 Pub. Ch. 650
2024-04-04SenateSigned by Governor.
2024-03-26SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2024-03-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2024-03-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2024-03-20SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2024-03-18HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2024-03-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2024-03-07HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2024-03-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2024-03-04SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2024-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/4/2024
2024-02-27SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2024-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2024
2024-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2235 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 650

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback