TN SB2584 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1005
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1005
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of children's services to report annually to the governor, the chief clerk of the senate, and the chief clerk of the house on probation and juvenile justice evidence-based treatment services; requires other reporting by juvenile court clerks. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
As enacted, requires the commissioner of children's services to report annually to the governor, the chief clerk of the senate, and the chief clerk of the house on probation and juvenile justice evidence-based treatment services; requires other reporting by juvenile court clerks. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 1005 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-13 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0896) |
2016-04-13 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0701) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2493 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1005