TN SB2580 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts "The Capital Punishment Enforcement Act", which provides that if the lethal injection method of carrying out the punishment of death is found to be unconstitutional or the commissioner certifies to the governor that an essential ingredient for that method is unavailable, the method of carrying out the death sentence is electrocution. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 23, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts "The Capital Punishment Enforcement Act", which provides that if the lethal injection method of carrying out the punishment of death is found to be unconstitutional or the commissioner certifies to the governor that an essential ingredient for that method is unavailable, the method of carrying out the death sentence is electrocution. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 23, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03HousePub. Ch. 1014
2014-06-03HouseEffective date(s) 07/01/2014
2014-05-22HouseSigned by Governor.
2014-05-13HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2014-05-07HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2014-05-01HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2014-04-28HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2014-04-17HouseS. concurred in H. am. 1
2014-04-16HousePlaced on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/17/2014
2014-04-16HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 13, PNV 3
2014-04-16HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1318)
2014-04-16HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1132)
2014-04-16HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2014-04-14SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2014-04-09SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2014-04-09SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 23, Nays 3, PNV 2
2014-04-09SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1005)
2014-04-09SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1004)
2014-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014
2014-03-26SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 1
2014-03-26SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
2014-03-25SenateAction Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014
2014-03-19SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
2014-02-10SenateP2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2014-02-06SenateIntro., P1C.
2014-02-05SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB2476 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1014

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback