TN SB2568 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1003
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, establishes requirements regarding the disposition of aborted fetuses and fetal tissue, including reporting requirements and requirements for interim inspections of and certain reporting by facilities where surgical abortions are performed. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, establishes requirements regarding the disposition of aborted fetuses and fetal tissue, including reporting requirements and requirements for interim inspections of and certain reporting by facilities where surgical abortions are performed. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-02 Pub. Ch. 1003
2016-05-02 Effective date(s) 04/27/2016
2016-04-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-04-21SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-04-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-19SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-04-18SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendment (Amendment 2 - HA 1117)
2016-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016
2016-04-14HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 79, Nays 9, PNV 1
2016-04-14HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1117)
2016-04-14HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1116)
2016-04-14HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-04-13HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2016-04-11SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-04-11SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 2, PNV 1
2016-04-11SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0848)
2016-04-11SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0908)
2016-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2016
2016-04-07SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2016
2016-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/7/2016
2016-03-31SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-31SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/7/2016
2016-03-29SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/31/2016
2016-03-22SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2
2016-03-22SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
2016-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2016-01-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2577 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1003

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback