TN SB2568 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits a community college to begin operating at a location in the service area of another community college that has ceased operations at the location. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits a community college to begin operating at a location in the service area of another community college that has ceased operations at the location. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-23 P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
2012-01-19 Intro., P1C.
2012-01-18 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB2805 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback