TN SB2568 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that when a court is determining the best interest of a child for purposes of custody and visitation, the court shall consider whether a parent has a diagnosable addiction unlikely to change within a reasonable time that would make the parent or caregiver unlikely to provide acceptable care for the child. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6; Title 36, Chapter 2 and Title 37, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that when a court is determining the best interest of a child for purposes of custody and visitation, the court shall consider whether a parent has a diagnosable addiction unlikely to change within a reasonable time that would make the parent or caregiver unlikely to provide acceptable care for the child. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6; Title 36, Chapter 2 and Title 37, Chapter 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-27 P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2010-01-25 Intro., P1C.
2010-01-15 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB2658 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-16 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Family Justice of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback