TN SB2560 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an LEA to include media literacy skills in a character education curriculum; encourages the department of education to post media literacy resources for LEAs to the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires an LEA to include media literacy skills in a character education curriculum; encourages the department of education to post media literacy resources for LEAs to the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2595 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration