TN SB2560 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1078
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1078
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the sales and use tax exemption for repair and refurbishment services with respect to airplanes and airplane components and parts that are situated outside Tennessee and removed from Tennessee within 15 days from the completion of the repair or refurbishment services with respect to the airplanes or airplane components are performed pursuant to and by an authorized service facility designated by an original equipment manufacturer for such service with respect to aircraft qualifying as "Transport Category Aircraft" under federal law. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the sales and use tax exemption for repair and refurbishment services with respect to airplanes and airplane components and parts that are situated outside Tennessee and removed from Tennessee within 15 days from the completion of the repair or refurbishment services with respect to the airplanes or airplane components are performed pursuant to and by an authorized service facility designated by an original equipment manufacturer for such service with respect to aircraft qualifying as "Transport Category Aircraft" under federal law. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1078 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-05-01 | Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 8 | |
2012-05-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1394) | |
2012-05-01 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-27 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-04-27 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 22, Nays 8 | |
2012-04-27 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1318) | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 | |
2012-04-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Ref. to S. F,W&M w/o recommend, as amended | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2551 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1078