TN SB2552 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, by no later than January 1, 2021, the departments of health and mental health and substance abuse services, and the bureau of TennCare to collaborate to develop educational materials for providers and facilities where medication assisted treatment including treatment involving controlled substances is prescribed or provided; requires that the materials be made available to prescribers of such treatment for substance abuse disorder. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 53; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires, by no later than January 1, 2021, the departments of health and mental health and substance abuse services, and the bureau of TennCare to collaborate to develop educational materials for providers and facilities where medication assisted treatment including treatment involving controlled substances is prescribed or provided; requires that the materials be made available to prescribers of such treatment for substance abuse disorder. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 53; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 747 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0799) |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0599) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2625 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 747