TN SB2546 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the Tennessee bureau of investigation to review the number of expunction petitions filed in the prior year for crimes committed prior to November 1, 1989, the number of those petitions that were granted, and the number that were rejected; requires the TBI to report its findings to the general assembly in January 2020. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, requires the Tennessee bureau of investigation to review the number of expunction petitions filed in the prior year for crimes committed prior to November 1, 1989, the number of those petitions that were granted, and the number that were rejected; requires the TBI to report its findings to the general assembly in January 2020. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2513 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.