TN SB2540 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a community of schools to support academic achievement in programs such as Innovation Zones and to participate in community policing programs that emphasize community outreach referral services. - Amends TCA Section 38-8-114 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a community of schools to support academic achievement in programs such as Innovation Zones and to participate in community policing programs that emphasize community outreach referral services. - Amends TCA Section 38-8-114 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2076 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning