TN SB2538 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates an autism spectrum disorder task force to study and make recommendations to the general assembly regarding ways to improve access to programs and services for early screening, diagnosis, and treatment of autism spectrum disorders in this state. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, creates an autism spectrum disorder task force to study and make recommendations to the general assembly regarding ways to improve access to programs and services for early screening, diagnosis, and treatment of autism spectrum disorders in this state. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Rep. Steve McManus [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 1010 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 05/22/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-23 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 84, Nays 2 |
2014-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1044) |
2014-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0829) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0836) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2257 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1010