TN SB2537 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that grants provided by the department to provide assistance to distressed counties and communities in this state require a 10-percent match of funds raised locally, which may include public and private funds. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 7, relative to grants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-05SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2024-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2024
2024-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2314 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback