TN SB2533 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the exemption from licensure to hunt and fish on farmlands owned by a spouse, parent, or grandparent, to include spouses of children of landowners. - Amends TCA Title 70.
Title
As enacted, extends the exemption from licensure to hunt and fish on farmlands owned by a spouse, parent, or grandparent, to include spouses of children of landowners. - Amends TCA Title 70.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Southerland [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 746 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 10/01/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0786) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0786) |
2020-06-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2414 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 746