TN SB2530 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Community Accountability for Juvenile Justice and Violence Act," which changes from September 1 to October 1 the date by which the commission on children and youth must make budget recommendations for the following fiscal year to the governor, finance committees of the house and senate, legislative budget offices, and affected state departments. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to juveniles.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1637 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-12 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.