TN SB2526 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 10 percent to 15 percent, the minimum number of qualified voters who voted in the last gubernatorial election that is required to file a petition calling for a referendum on the question of whether a privilege tax should be imposed on businesses making sales in a tourism development zone; requires the petition to be filed within 45 days, rather than 30 days, of final approval of an ordinance authorizing the privilege tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 30.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 30, relative to the Local Tourism Development Zone Business Tax Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2671 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.