TN SB2523 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes the current manner in which liquor-by-the-drink tax proceeds are distributed to local political subdivisions permanent. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, makes the current manner in which liquor-by-the-drink tax proceeds are distributed to local political subdivisions permanent. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 696 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2832 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 696