TN SB2523 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, restricts political activity of members of the registry of election finance only during the duration of their term rather than during their term and one year subsequent to their term. - Amends TCA Section 2-10-203(j).
Title
As introduced, restricts political activity of members of the registry of election finance only during the duration of their term rather than during their term and one year subsequent to their term. - Amends TCA Section 2-10-203(j).
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1742 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee