TN SB2520 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 917
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 917
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes counties and municipalities, by resolution or ordinance of their governing bodies, to levy a tax on the retail sale of food and food ingredients for human consumption within the county or municipality at a rate less than the local option sales tax rate. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 7, relative to the retail sale of food and food ingredients.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 917 | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2641 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 05/03/2024