TN SB2518 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that the display of the American flag on school property and at school events conform to the requirements of federal law; requires a local board of education to permit display of the American flag, if the display conforms to the requirements of federal law. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires that the display of the American flag on school property and at school events conform to the requirements of federal law; requires a local board of education to permit display of the American flag, if the display conforms to the requirements of federal law. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754 | |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1722 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 754