TN SB2517 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, punishes the offense of promotion of prostitution as a Class D felony instead of Class E felony if the person being promoted has an intellectual disability. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, punishes the offense of promotion of prostitution as a Class D felony instead of Class E felony if the person being promoted has an intellectual disability. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 1019
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-05-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-30SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-25HousePassed H., Ayes 83, Nays 0, PNV 1
2018-04-25HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0811)
2018-04-25HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-12HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-08SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-08SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2018-03-08SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0664)
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/8/2018
2018-02-28SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
2018-02-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
2018-02-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/27/2018
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1930 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback