TN SB2516 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 974
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 974
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act". - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 62 and Title 66.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act". - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 62 and Title 66.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 974 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 05/19/2014; 07/01/2015 |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | House | S. concurred in H. am. #3 |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 4 |
2014-04-14 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA1083) |
2014-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1082) |
2014-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0820) |
2014-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0831) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2427 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 974