TN SB2515 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to provide written and electronic notice to the employing company of a person appointed and commissioned as a state facility protection officer to provide facility security when the department no longer requires the service of such person. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38 and Title 68, relative to the department of safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2304 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration