TN SB2514 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Dallas's Law," which revises various provisions governing security guards/officers. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 57 and Title 62, Chapter 35.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29; Title 57 and Title 62, Chapter 35, relative to security guards/officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2023 | |
2022-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 1121 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA1004) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 74, Nays 9, PNV 9 |
2022-04-27 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1004) |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0747) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 1 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0808) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0683) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2283 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1121