TN SB2513 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes a procedure for the recognition of hospitals with stroke-related designations; establishes protocol guidelines for pre-hospital assessment, treatment, education, and transport of stroke patients; makes other related changes. - Amends TCA Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes a procedure for the recognition of hospitals with stroke-related designations; establishes protocol guidelines for pre-hospital assessment, treatment, education, and transport of stroke patients; makes other related changes. - Amends TCA Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-29SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-03-29HousePassed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-03-29HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0728)
2018-03-29HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-12HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-08SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-08SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2018-03-08SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0672)
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/8/2018
2018-02-28SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2167 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-29 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback