TN SB2500 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the emergency communications board to meet on a bimonthly basis instead of a quarterly basis, and authorizes the board to also meet upon the call of a majority of the voting members of the board. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, requires the emergency communications board to meet on a bimonthly basis instead of a quarterly basis, and authorizes the board to also meet upon the call of a majority of the voting members of the board. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2454 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee