TN SB2494 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes order of priority of entities to be awarded funds that become available to the department of health for family planning programs, in excess of funds needed to operate family planning programs in county or district health departments. - Amends TCA Section 68-34-105.
Title
As enacted, establishes order of priority of entities to be awarded funds that become available to the department of health for family planning programs, in excess of funds needed to operate family planning programs in county or district health departments. - Amends TCA Section 68-34-105.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] |
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 660 | |
2018-04-11 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2018 | |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 74, Nays 15, PNV 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0726) |
2018-03-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0670) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2262 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 660