TN SB2488 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the additional state tax of 2.75 percent applied to the amount of single articles in excess of $1,600 but less than or equal to $3,200; authorizes local governments to impose a local tax up to 2.75 percent on such amount. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 157 of the Public Acts of 2019; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 452 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Title
As introduced, deletes the additional state tax of 2.75 percent applied to the amount of single articles in excess of $1,600 but less than or equal to $3,200; authorizes local governments to impose a local tax up to 2.75 percent on such amount. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 157 of the Public Acts of 2019; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 452 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2640 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee