TN SB2483 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lowers amount of revenue required from sale of artwork from 90 percent to 80 percent in order for an art gallery that does not sell food or beverages to serve wine to patrons. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, lowers amount of revenue required from sale of artwork from 90 percent to 80 percent in order for an art gallery that does not sell food or beverages to serve wine to patrons. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2481 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee