TN SB2481 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a Class C misdemeanor for a person who has not attained 21 years of age to consume or possess vapor products on public school property that serves any of the grades kindergarten through 12. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39 and Title 49, relative to tobacco, smoking hemp, and vapor products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2563 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee