TN SB2481 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of human services to study the feasibility of implementing drug testing program for recipients of welfare programs administered by the department; requires the commissioner to report recommendations to the health committee of the house of representatives and the senate health and welfare committee no later than January 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of human services to study the feasibility of implementing drug testing program for recipients of welfare programs administered by the department; requires the commissioner to report recommendations to the health committee of the house of representatives and the senate health and welfare committee no later than January 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2481 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee