TN SB2481 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1063
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes the random verification audit requirement; revises certain provisions governing disqualification for benefits and regaining eligibility after sickness, disability, or pregnancy. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, removes the random verification audit requirement; revises certain provisions governing disqualification for benefits and regaining eligibility after sickness, disability, or pregnancy. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Make Action of the Senate MOTION TO ADOPT Conference Committee Report (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 64 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY Green (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23 Pub. Ch. 1063
2016-05-23 Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
2016-05-20SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-05-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-05-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-25SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-04-22HouseConf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 64, Nays 19 PNV 0
2016-04-22SenateConference Committee report adopted, ayes 28 nays 2
2016-04-21SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/22/2016
2016-04-21HouseConf. comm. appointed ( Holt, Lynn, Turner)
2016-04-21SenateConference Committee appointed. (Johnson, Green, Massey)
2016-04-21HouseH. refused to recede from am. no. SA3 SB2481
2016-04-21HouseH. refused to recede from am. no. SA1 SB2481
2016-04-21SenateSenate refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
2016-04-21HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/21/2016
2016-04-21SenateSenate refused to concur in amendments #1 & #3
2016-04-20SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/21/2016
2016-04-20HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 19, PNV 1
2016-04-20HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1233)
2016-04-20HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1232)
2016-04-20HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0904)
2016-04-20HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-04-20SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-04-20SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 3
2016-04-20SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1049)
2016-04-20SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0716)
2016-04-20SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA1053)
2016-04-20SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/20/2016
2016-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016
2016-04-19SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2016
2016-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
2016-04-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2016
2016-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016
2016-04-14SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016
2016-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016
2016-04-13SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2016
2016-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2016
2016-04-11SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2016
2016-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2016
2016-04-04SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2016
2016-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016
2016-03-22SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2016-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
2016-03-08SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2016-03-02SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
2016-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2016-01-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2512 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1063

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback