TN SB2481 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires sellers of residential property to disclose to buyer, prior to entering into a contract, whether a wildlife management area is located within 300 feet of the property line. - Amends TCA Title 66 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, requires sellers of residential property to disclose to buyer, prior to entering into a contract, whether a wildlife management area is located within 300 feet of the property line. - Amends TCA Title 66 and Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-01-19 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2012-01-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2457 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-14 - Failed In s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2481&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2481.pdf |