TN SB2468 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the index of appropriations from state tax revenues for 2019-2020 fiscal year to exceed the index of estimated growth in the state's economy by $629 million or 3.6 percent.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the index of appropriations from state tax revenues for 2019-2020 fiscal year to exceed the index of estimated growth in the state's economy by $629 million or 3.6 percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 650 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2819 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 650