TN SB2466 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires certain training and examination in order to use the title "certified animal massage therapist" or "registered animal massage therapist;" requires liability insurance. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 12.
Title
As enacted, requires certain training and examination in order to use the title "certified animal massage therapist" or "registered animal massage therapist;" requires liability insurance. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 12.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679 | |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2080 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 679