TN SB2465 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Fresh Start Act". - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 76, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Fresh Start Act". - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 76, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23 Pub. Ch. 793
2018-04-23 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-04-20SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-12SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-10SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-06SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-05HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-05HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0878)
2018-04-05HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-29HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-29SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-28SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-28SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2018-03-28SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0705)
2018-03-27SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018
2018-03-26SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/28/2018
2018-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018
2018-03-19SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-06SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/6/2018
2018-02-07SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2248 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 793

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback