TN SB2448 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends termination date from July 1, 2022, to July 1, 2023, for limitations on claims against a person for loss, damage, injury, or death arising from COVID-19. - Amends TCA Section 9-8-307; Title 14, Chapter 5; Title 29, Chapter 20 and Section 49-7-159.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 9-8-307; Title 14, Chapter 5; Title 29, Chapter 20 and Section 49-7-159, relative to liability.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Effective date(s) 06/01/2022 | |
2022-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 1117 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-28 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 78, Nays 7 PNV 0 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, |
2022-04-21 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Farmer, Zachary, Beck, Curcio) |
2022-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/21/22 |
2022-04-18 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/18/22 |
2022-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/18/22 |
2022-04-04 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/18/2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/4/22 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (White, Bailey, Johnson, Stevens, Yarbro) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from its non-concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. HA1&2 SB2448 |
2022-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/24/22 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House amendments #1 and #2 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 67, Nays 16, PNV 2 |
2022-03-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0624) |
2022-03-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0579) |
2022-03-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 5 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/28/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2671 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1117