TN SB2444 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class A misdemeanor of harassment of a minor because of the employment of the parent. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, creates the Class A misdemeanor of harassment of a minor because of the employment of the parent. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Ophelia Ford [D] | Rep. Gary Odom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2100 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-11 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2444&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2444.pdf |