TN SB2443 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 996
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 996
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Health Care Empowerment Act". - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Health Care Empowerment Act". - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 996 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0990) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0989) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/11/2016 |
2016-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 5, PNV 2 |
2016-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0990) |
2016-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0989) |
2016-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0614) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2323 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 996