TN SB2442 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an animal owner's relative to retrieve the animal from an animal control agency within seven days of the owner's death; permits the animal control agency to treat the animal as an abandoned animal if the relative has not retrieved the animal within seven days. - Amends TCA Title 44; Title 63, Chapter 12 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires an animal owner's relative to retrieve the animal from an animal control agency within seven days of the owner's death; permits the animal control agency to treat the animal as an abandoned animal if the relative has not retrieved the animal within seven days. - Amends TCA Title 44; Title 63, Chapter 12 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2543 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee