TN SB2441 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires commission to suspend or revoke a license or permit instead of imposing a fine after the third violation within a two-year period. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, requires commission to suspend or revoke a license or permit instead of imposing a fine after the third violation within a two-year period. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2330 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-25 - Action Def. in State Government Committee to summer study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2441&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2441.pdf |