TN SB2440 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to disclose on the department's website certain information related to state-funded travel for public employees to events at which state vendors or potential vendors are present. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 8; Title 12; Title 41 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to disclose on the department's website certain information related to state-funded travel for public employees to events at which state vendors or potential vendors are present. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 8; Title 12; Title 41 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2593 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/14/2018