TN SB2436 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a municipality to create and manage a fund for the purpose of subsidizing the cost of transportation for disabled veterans and senior citizens; authorizes the municipality to prescribe the criteria for qualifying for assistance from the fund; limits assistance from such fund to not more than $1,000 per person in a calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1 and Title 7.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a municipality to create and manage a fund for the purpose of subsidizing the cost of transportation for disabled veterans and senior citizens; authorizes the municipality to prescribe the criteria for qualifying for assistance from the fund; limits assistance from such fund to not more than $1,000 per person in a calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1 and Title 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2569 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee