TN SB2430 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends until 2025 the reporting requirement to the department of revenue by certain wholesalers of food, candy, and nonalcoholic beverages regarding net sales of such products to retailers; requires the comptroller to conduct a review of the retail accountability program regarding the reporting required for sales of food, candy, and nonalcoholic beverages, to determine the effectiveness and efficiency of the program. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-410.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-6-410, relative to wholesaler information reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/14/2022 | |
2022-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 887 | |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0761) |
2022-03-31 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0581) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2180 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 887