TN SB2430 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires real property owners to disclose to purchasers or purchasers' representatives or lenders to purchasers, whether the road on which the property is located is a private or public road and the name of the person or entity responsible for its maintenance. - Amends TCA Title 54; Title 55 and Title 66.
Title
As introduced, requires real property owners to disclose to purchasers or purchasers' representatives or lenders to purchasers, whether the road on which the property is located is a private or public road and the name of the person or entity responsible for its maintenance. - Amends TCA Title 54; Title 55 and Title 66.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2449 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee