TN SB2423 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commission to prescribe requirements for a notice that must be prominently posted at the establishment of a retail package store licensee that sells at retail a product containing a hemp-derived cannabinoid, including the age restriction for purchasing such products and other information regarding consumer health and safety. - Amends TCA Title 43; Title 57 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 43; Title 57 and Title 67, relative to hemp-derived products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2024-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2670 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback